HI HCR106 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR106
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 40
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Transportation To Designate The Reef Runway As The Frank T. Okimoto Reef Runway.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Transportation To Designate The Reef Runway As The Frank T. Okimoto Reef Runway.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 40 |
2020-03-06 | House | Offered |
2020-03-05 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR87 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 40
HCR106 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 33
HCR106 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 33
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=106&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HCR106_.HTM |