HI HB998 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB998
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to WTL/AEN, CPH.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to WTL/AEN, CPH.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the DLNR to allow bottomfish fishing in six of the Bottomfish Restricted Fishing Areas and to amend any administrative rules to provide that any restriction on fishing shall be based on scientific evidence of environmental necessity. (HB998 HD2)
Title
Relating To Bottomfish.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to WTL/AEN, CPH. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 311). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) LoPresti voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 996) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Oshiro, Thielen; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-28-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Souki excused (3). |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 435) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-02-07 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Gates, Creagan, DeCoite, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-06 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Tuesday, 02-07-17 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to OMH, JUD, referral sheet 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB998 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to WTL/AEN, CPH.