HI HB995 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB995
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorize establishment of a ceiling for the Dietitian Licensure Special Fund through the state budgeting process to meet expanding program needs and diminish dependence on the general fund.
Title
Relating To Dietitian Licensure Special Fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB995 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 2
SB1149 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 22
SB1149 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 22
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=995&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB995_.HTM |