HI HB995 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-14 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-14 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires fiscal accountability measures at the school level. Requires the BOE to develop an appeals process for when school principals set aside a school community council decision. Requires school principal evaluations to assess the performance of principals in carrying out statutory powers and duties.
Title
School Finances; School Community Councils; Appeals Process; Principal Evaluations
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Jessica Wooley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-14 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-14-11 2:00PM in conference room 309. | |
2011-02-09 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 02-14-11 at 2:00 PM. | |
2011-02-04 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN/LAB on Wednesday, 02-09-11 2:00PM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to EDN/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=995 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HB995_.HTM |