HI HB994 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB994
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes director of transportation to impose toll charges on existing highways and construct new toll roads. Provides for agreement with private entities to construct, operate, and maintain toll roads. Prohibits toll roads where there is no toll-free alternative route available for public use. Requires a prior feasibility study and specifies criteria, including consideration of an elevated toll road.
Title
Relating To Toll Roads.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-15 | House | Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 20 |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB994 (Carry Over) 2017-02-15 - Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 20
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=994&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB994_.HTM |