HI HB990 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB990

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the marriage license statute to support the Hawaii Birth Defects Program, modernization of the vital statistics system, and operating costs of marriage license agents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Marriage License Fees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-12HouseThe committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2021-02-10HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 02-16-21 10:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
2021-01-29HouseReferred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 2
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-25HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1144 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB990 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback