HI HB988 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB988

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the definitions "coach" and "person-centered support plan" under kupuna care and caregiver support services laws. Allows for qualified caregivers to continue providing services even if they work less than thirty hours a week during a declared state of emergency. Adds traditional services and kupuna caregiver-directed services to the kupuna caregivers program. Allows funds allocated to qualified caregivers under the program to be issued directly to a financial management service provider. Effective 07/01/2060. (HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Services For Kupuna.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-12 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-18HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
2021-02-18HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 383) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2021-02-12HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas.
2021-02-10HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-12-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-10HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli excused (1).
2021-02-10HouseReported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 139) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2021-02-05HouseThe committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Har, Kapela, LoPresti, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Gates.
2021-02-02HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Friday, 02-05-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-29HouseReferred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-25HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1142 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB988 (Carry Over) 2021-02-18 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback