HI HB977 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB977
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defines duly qualified physician or surgeon. Allows an employee to record medical examinations of the employee that are ordered by the Director of Labor and Industrial Relations. Allows employees to have a chaperone present at medical examinations.
Title
Relating To Workers' Compensation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-31 | House | Re-referred to LAB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 8 |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to LAB, CPC, referral sheet 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB977 (Carry Over) 2017-01-31 - Re-referred to LAB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 8
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=977&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB977_.HTM |