HI HB975 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB975

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - The committee(s) on WAM deleted the measure from the public hearing on 04-05-18 10:15AM in conference room 211.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Creates an Advisory Council for Global Economic Competitiveness to be attached to DBEDT. Directs the council to recommend policy additions and changes to attract more foreign direct investment and increase state exports abroad. Appropriates funds. (HB975 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Economic Development.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-04SenateThe committee(s) on WAM deleted the measure from the public hearing on 04-05-18 10:15AM in conference room 211.
2018-04-02SenateThe committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-05-18 10:15AM in conference room 211.
2017-11-30 Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
2017-03-24SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2017-03-24SenateReported from ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1152) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2017-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ETT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Baker, Galuteria, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2017-03-17SenateThe committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-17 2:40PM in conference room 414.
2017-03-17SenateThe committee(s) on ETT deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-20-17 3:15PM in conference room 414.
2017-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-17 3:15PM in conference room 414.
2017-03-13SenateRe-Referred to ETT, WAM.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to ETT/IAA, WAM.
2017-03-03SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-03-03SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 51).
2017-03-02HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2017-03-02HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 769), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2017-02-22HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Choy.
2017-02-18HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-22-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2017-02-16HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Souki excused (3).
2017-02-16HouseReported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 429) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2017-02-10HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Holt, Johanson, Takumi, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2017-02-07HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 02-10-17 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
2017-01-27HouseReferred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 4
2017-01-25HousePass First Reading
2017-01-23HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB975 (Carry Over) 2017-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback