HI HB960 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-03 - Act 175, 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1278).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-03 - Act 175, 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1278).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Explicitly includes prekindergarten facilities within the scope of authority of the School Facilities Authority. Transfers $200,000,000 of general funds previously appropriated to the School Facilities Authority of the Department of Education to the School Facilities Special Fund for FY 2023-2024. Appropriates funds out of the School Facilities Special Fund for the School Facilities Authority to expand access to eligible children for prekindergarten. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The School Facilities Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-03 | Senate | Act 175, 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1278). |
2023-07-03 | House | Act 175, on 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1278). |
2023-05-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2023-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 996). |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 901). |
2023-05-04 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Martinez excused (2). |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1) Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Deferred One Day 05-04-23. |
2023-05-02 | House | Deferred one day 05-04-23. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 120). |
2023-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-02-23. |
2023-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 120) as amended in (CD 1). |
2023-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, DeCoite; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2023-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kitagawa, Kapela, Marten; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Garcia. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 1:30PM; Conference Room 229. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-23 4:31PM; Conference Room 229. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-23 3:20PM; Conference Room 229. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-23 1:30PM; Conference Room 229. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 839). |
2023-04-21 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Kitagawa Co-Chairs; Kapela, Marten, Garcia. |
2023-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 914). |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; DeCoite Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800). |
2023-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2023-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 794) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-23. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1739) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Aquino, Shimabukuro. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-23 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1376) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 03-22-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 229. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 03-20-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 229. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 85). |
2023-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 888), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-02-24 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Garrett. |
2023-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-23 1:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-02-07 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 126) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-02-02 | House | The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Marten, Kapela, Martinez, Matayoshi, Quinlan, Todd, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Perruso; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 02-02-23 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB826 (Same As) 2023-03-09 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 17