HI HB957 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB957
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii State Fusion Center as a program under the Office of Homeland Security as described in chapter 128A, Hawaii Revised Statutes. Establishes the position of Hawaii State Fusion Center Director. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Homeland Security.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Higher Education & Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Higher Education & Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3398) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite, Baker, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-22 1:05PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 106). |
2022-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 811-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt. |
2022-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-28-22 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1). |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported from PDP/HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 475) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-16 | House | The committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, DeCoite, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Kapela, Ohno, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Quinlan, Woodson. |
2021-02-16 | House | The committees on PDP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Eli, Cullen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Wildberger, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2021-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PDP/HET on Tuesday, 02-16-21 11:00AM in House conference room 309 & 312 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to PDP/HET, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1111 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB957 (Carry Over) 2021-02-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
HB957 (Carry Over) 2021-02-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).