HI HB956 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Merges the condominium management education fund under old condominium law into the condominium education trust fund established under new condominium law. Effective 01/01/2020. (HB956 HD1)
Title
Condominiums
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Bertram, Takai, Takumi excused (3). | |
2009-02-17 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 312) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2009-02-09 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Wakai, Belatti, Ito, Karamatsu, Luke, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cabanilla; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, McKelvey, Mizuno, Morita. | |
2009-02-05 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-09-09 2:15 PM in House conference room 325. | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 | |
2009-01-28 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Pending introduction. |