HI HB954 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Act 163, 06/30/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1266).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Act 163, 06/30/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1266).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the household and dependent care services tax credit for five years. Increases the refundable earned income tax credit for five years. Increases the income thresholds and credit amounts of the refundable food/excise tax credit for five years. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Senate | Act 163, 06/30/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1266). |
2023-06-30 | House | Act 163, on 06/30/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1266). |
2023-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 900). |
2023-05-02 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 993). |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 135). |
2023-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-02-23. |
2023-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 135) as amended in (CD 1). |
2023-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Yamashita, Evslin, Ilagan, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nakamura; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa, Nishimoto, Pierick. |
2023-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 3:00PM in conference room 309. |
2023-04-27 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-28-23 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2023-04-26 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 982). |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Keith-Agaran, Fevella. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 880). |
2023-04-25 | House | House Conferees Added: Representatives Nishimoto, Nakamura, Morikawa, Ilagan added as Conferees. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 867). |
2023-04-24 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Holt, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Evslin, Kitagawa, Lamosao, Pierick. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800). |
2023-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2023-04-13 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 884) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) DeCoite, Ihara, Keohokalole). Transmitted to House. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-23 |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 2). |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 3 offered. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-23. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1780) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | The committee on WAM will reconsider its previous decision made on 04-04-23 and will hold a public decision making on 04-05-2023 12:31 PM; Conference Room 211. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-04-23 10:35AM; Conference Room 211. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-03-23 9:40AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 364). |
2023-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1178) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-03-01 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Alcos. |
2023-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-01-23 2:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2023-02-15 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 474) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-02-08 | House | The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, Hussey-Burdick, Kong, Nakamura, Quinlan, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 02-08-23 10:15AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Earned Income Tax Credit
Household and Dependent Care Services Tax Credit
Refundable Food/Excise Tax Credit
Household and Dependent Care Services Tax Credit
Refundable Food/Excise Tax Credit