HI HB953 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-05 - Act 182, 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1285).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-05 - Act 182, 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1285).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DLNR to develop and publish a website and mobile application that includes the application processes, including a means of collecting any fees, for a permit, license, or reservation needed to conduct recreational and commercial activities in the State. Requires DLNR to make available existing application processes in a digital format to be used on the website and mobile application. Appropriates funds for the establishment of the website and mobile application. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Land And Natural Resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-05 | Senate | Act 182, 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1285). |
2023-07-05 | House | Act 182, on 07/03/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1285). |
2023-05-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2023-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 996). |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 901). |
2023-05-04 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Lowen, Martinez excused (2). |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1) Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Deferred One Day 05-04-23. |
2023-05-02 | House | Deferred one day 05-04-23. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 140). |
2023-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-02-23. |
2023-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 140) as amended in (CD 1). |
2023-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Morikawa, Chun, Poepoe, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 5:00PM in conference room 229. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 12:00PM; Conference Room 229. |
2023-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 9:45AM in conference room 229. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-23 9:45AM; Conference Room 229. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 229. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 839). |
2023-04-21 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ichiyama, Quinlan, Morikawa Co-Chairs; Chun, Poepoe, Souza. |
2023-04-21 | House | Re-referred to WAL, TOU, FIN, referral sheet 34 |
2023-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 909). |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Elefante. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800). |
2023-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2023-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 793) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-23. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1738) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2023-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Aquino, Shimabukuro. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-23 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1214) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-13-23 1:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 363). |
2023-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1208), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-03-01 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Alcos. |
2023-02-28 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-01-23 3:30PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-28 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-01-23 3:30PM. |
2023-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-23 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1). |
2023-02-17 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 649) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-02-07 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-07-23 9:30AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Appropriation
Commercial Activities
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Expenditure Ceiling ($)
Fees
Licenses
Mobile Application
Permits
Recreational Activities
Reservations
Website
Commercial Activities
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Expenditure Ceiling ($)
Fees
Licenses
Mobile Application
Permits
Recreational Activities
Reservations
Website