HI HB951 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB951
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the offense of manslaughter to include cases where a person knowingly distributes a dangerous drug in any amount and another person dies as a result of ingesting that drug. (HB951 HD1)
Title
Relating To Manslaughter.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-08 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 432). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 949) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-08 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Thielen. |
2019-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-19. |
2019-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-06-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-19. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-05-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to JUD , referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1178 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB951 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to JDC.
HB951 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to JDC.