HI HB95 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB95
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the licensing procedures of the industrial hemp pilot program by allowing applicants to apply for a license at any time during the year in which the applicant plans to grow industrial hemp.
Title
Relating To Industrial Hemp.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] |
Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to AEN, CPH. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 81). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 881), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-02 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Aquino, Fukumoto. |
2017-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-02-17 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-02-22 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-02-17. |
2017-02-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-22-17 2:01PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro excused (2). |
2017-02-15 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 338), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2017-02-10 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-10-17 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to AGR, CPC, referral sheet 1 |
2017-01-19 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB95 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to AEN, CPH.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=95&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB95_.HTM |