HI HB942 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Act 035, 06/19/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1135).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Act 035, 06/19/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1135).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the State Foundation on Culture and the Arts to commission an artist to design and build a monument to honor and commemorate Filipino veterans of World War II, with all costs to be expended from the Works of Art Special Fund. (HB942 CD1)
Title
Relating To Filipino Veterans.
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Act 035, 06/19/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1135). |
2017-06-22 | House | Act 035, on 06/19/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1135). |
2017-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 114). |
2017-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 114) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Nishihara, Dela Cruz; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Cullen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 1:00PM in conference room 312. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-17 1:00PM in conference room 312. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Nishihara, Dela Cruz Co-Chairs. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ito, Cullen Co-Chairs; McDermott. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 584). |
2017-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-07 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 530) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) English, Espero, Wakai). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-07-17. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1479) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-17 1:40PM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported from IAA/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1160) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Ihara. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on IAA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in IAA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, S. Chang, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Ihara. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on IAA/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-17 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to IAA/PSM, WAM. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 48). |
2017-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 745), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Choy. |
2017-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-23-17 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Souki excused (3). |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 422) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-09 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Tokioka, Cachola, Choy, Onishi, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno. |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Thursday, 02-09-17 9:30AM in House conference room 429. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |