HI HB935 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB935
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-01 - Re-referred to HLT/ECD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-01 - Re-referred to HLT/ECD, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts from the general excise tax, gross receipts received from the sale of hearing aids.
Title
Relating To Hearing Aids.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-01 | House | Re-referred to HLT/ECD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB935 (Carry Over) 2023-02-01 - Re-referred to HLT/ECD, FIN, referral sheet 6
SB606 (Same As) 2023-03-09 - Referred to HLT/ECD, FIN, referral sheet 17
SB606 (Same As) 2023-03-09 - Referred to HLT/ECD, FIN, referral sheet 17
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=935&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/HB935_.HTM |