HI HB933 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB933
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a crisis intervention and diversion program in the department of health to divert those in need to appropriate health care and away from the criminal justice system. Appropriates funds. Sunsets on 6/30/2023. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Crisis Intervention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-20 9:45AM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to CPH/JDC, WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 122). |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 833-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger, McDermott. |
2020-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-20 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-14 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 591-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-02-12 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakashima, Perruso, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-12-20 2:15PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-20 at 2:15PM. |
2020-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-11-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2). |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from HLT/HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 251-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-02-06 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-06 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/HSH on Thursday, 02-06-20 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-01 | House | The committee(s) on HLT/HSH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/HSH on Friday, 02-01-19 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HLT/HSH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB933 (Carry Over) 2019-02-01 - The committee(s) on HLT/HSH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.