HI HB933 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-06 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Say excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-06 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Say excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows BLNR to grant easements for less than fair market value for structures that were authorized and constructed landward of the shoreline within the record boundary of landward property at the time of construction, but are now located seaward of the shoreline on public land. Effective July 1, 2020. (HB933 HD1)
Title
Special Shoreline Encroachment Easements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Say excused (2). |
2013-02-06 | House | Reported from WAL/OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 158) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-02-01 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, C. Lee, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Coffman. |
2013-02-01 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Cullen, Hanohano, Kawakami, C. Lee, Fale; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Coffman. |
2013-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/OMH on Friday, 02-01-13 8:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to WAL/OMH, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1164 (Same As) 2013-02-11 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.