HI HB93 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB93
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defines digital media account. Prohibits contracts that prohibit, limit, or restrict the transfer of a digital media account upon the account holder's death, and provides for the transfer of a decedent's digital media account to a devisee or heir.
Title
Relating To Digital Media.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB93 (Carry Over) 2019-02-13 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB297 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to TEC/CPH, JDC.
SB297 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to TEC/CPH, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=93&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB93_.HTM |