HI HB925 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB925

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates and authorizes funds for collective bargaining cost items for the members of bargaining unit (11) and their excluded counterparts, including the cost of salary adjustments negotiated between the State and the bargaining unit representative for fiscal biennium 2021-2023. Effective 12/25/2040. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Public Employment Cost Items.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-04-19SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560).
2021-04-16HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 807).
2021-04-16HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Onishi, Cullen Co-Chairs; Sayama, Okimoto.
2021-04-16SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558).
2021-04-15SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Fevella.
2021-04-15HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2021-04-13HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 725) in amended form (SD 1).
2021-04-13SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-04-09SenateOne Day Notice 04-13-21.
2021-04-09SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1655) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2021-04-06SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Taniguchi.
2021-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-06-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
2021-03-25SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2021-03-25SenateReported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1188) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2021-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chang.
2021-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-21 3:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
2021-03-09SenateReferred to LCA, WAM.
2021-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 82).
2021-03-04HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2021-03-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 674), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2021-02-24HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-02-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-24-21 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-17HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1).
2021-02-17HouseReported from LAT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 327) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2021-02-11HouseThe committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Quinlan, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
2021-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAT on Thursday, 02-11-21 9:00AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
2021-01-29HouseReferred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 2
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-25HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1079 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB925 (Carry Over) 2021-04-19 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback