HI HB923 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB923

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the public employees' collective bargaining fund. Requires the deposit of not less than the amount equal to an undisclosed percentage of the total compensation provided to all public employees during the previous fiscal year. Amends the rights of public employee elective representation and deductions for nonmembers. Repeals the religious exemption from support of employee organization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Public Employees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-30 Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
2017-01-27HouseReferred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 4
2017-01-25HousePass First Reading
2017-01-23HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB923 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 4

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback