HI HB919 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB919

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the tuition residency rules for the University of Hawaii to grant the resident tuition fee for enrollment at any University of Hawaii campus, including any community college, to adult or minor students who have obtained a Hawaii high school diploma or equivalent credential and are working toward their first undergraduate degree, under certain conditions. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Residence For Tuition Purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2023-02-15HouseReported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 478) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2023-02-10HouseThe committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Kapela, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, Todd, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Woodson.
2023-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HET on Friday, 02-10-23 2:30PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-01-30HouseReferred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 3
2023-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2023-01-23HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB919 (Carry Over) 2023-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback