HI HB912 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Act 088, 07/05/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1189).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Act 088, 07/05/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1189).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows advanced practice registered nurses who hold an accredited national certification in an advanced practice registered nurse psychiatric specialization to offer care and services to minors and patients in assisted community treatment programs similar to care and services offered by physicians and other health care service providers. Requires advanced practice registered nurses proving care and services to patients in assisted community treatment to hold prescriptive authority. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Nursing.
Sponsors
Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] |
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | Act 088, 07/05/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1189). |
2017-07-07 | House | Act 088, on 07/05/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1189). |
2017-04-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 629). |
2017-04-26 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with Representative(s) Say voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har excused (1). |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 628). |
2017-04-25 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-13-17. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; S. Chang, Espero. |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 619) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1492) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-17 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 304). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 978) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Aquino. |
2017-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-28-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from HLT/IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 598) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2017-02-14 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Choy, Cachola, Onishi, Tokioka, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ito, Ward. |
2017-02-14 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro, Todd, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har. |
2017-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/IAC on Tuesday, 02-14-17 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to HLT/IAC, CPC, referral sheet 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Advanced Practice Registered Nurses
Assisted Community Treatment
Health Care Practitioners
Health Services
Minors
Psychiatric Specialization
Assisted Community Treatment
Health Care Practitioners
Health Services
Minors
Psychiatric Specialization