HI HB909 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB909
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a Center for Commercialization at the University of Hawaii to commercially use intellectual property generated from research at the University for the benefit of the State and its residents. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The University Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385). |
2018-03-14 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-01-17 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 1). |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-17 1:40PM in conference room 423. |
2017-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 1:45PM in conference room 423. |
2017-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-21-17 1:50PM in conference room 423. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Kahele Chair; Wakai, Dela Cruz Co-Chairs. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole, McKelvey, Nakamura Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 584). |
2017-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-07 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 526) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) English, Espero, Wakai). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-07-17. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1347) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Inouye, Taniguchi, Wakai. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-17 1:40PM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported from HRE/ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1131) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kidani, Espero, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ETT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, L. Thielen. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-17 1:30PM in conference room 414. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to HRE/ETT, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 158). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 886), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, LoPresti, Tupola. |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-17 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-17 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 672) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-02-16 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Creagan, Har, Ing, Onishi, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno. |
2017-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Thursday, 02-16-17 2:04PM in House conference room 309. |
2017-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro excused (1). |
2017-02-07 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 83) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED. |
2017-02-03 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Holt, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi. |
2017-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-03-17 9:00AM in conference room 309. |
2017-02-01 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-03-17 at 9:00AM. |
2017-01-30 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 02-01-17 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to EDB, HED, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB909 (Carry Over) 2017-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-17 1:40PM in conference room 423.