HI HB907 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB907
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts changes and improvements to existing portions of the Waianae coast emergency access road within the Waianae district of Oahu from environmental assessment requirements under chapter 343, Hawaii Revised Statutes.
Title
Relating To Highways.
Sponsors
Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] |
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to TRN/EEP, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB211 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB907 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to TRN/EEP, JUD, referral sheet 6
HB907 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to TRN/EEP, JUD, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=907&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB907_.HTM |