HI HB905 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Health to implement point of care newborn screening, and amends section 321-291, HRS, concerning the newborn metabolic screening special fund. Effective July 1, 2050. (HB905 HD1)
Title
Point of Care Newborn Screening
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Har, Say excused (3). |
2013-02-13 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 364) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-08 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Cabanilla, Carroll, Jordan, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-13 10:30AM in conference room 329. |
2013-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-13 at 10:30AM. |
2013-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-06-13 10:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1136 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.