HI HB904 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB904

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts active members of the Hawaii Emergency Management Agency and county emergency management agencies from jury duty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Exemptions From Jury Duty.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-30HouseReferred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
2023-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2023-01-23HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB904 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
SB1157 (Same As) 2023-01-27 - Referred to PSM, JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback