HI HB904 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB904
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the invasive species rapid response special fund within DLNR. Establishes procedures for emergency declarations and expenditures. Appropriates moneys into the special fund. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Invasive Species.
Sponsors
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Beth Fukumoto Chang [R] |
Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385). |
2018-03-14 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-01-17 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 1). |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 2:16PM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 12:31PM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 11:05AM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 11:05AM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 11:05AM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 11:05AM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; K. Rhoads, Riviere Co-Chairs. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Lowen Co-Chairs; Tupola. |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 618) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1590) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-17 1:40PM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Reported from AEN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1022) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Inouye, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-17 2:15PM in conference room 224. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to AEN/WTL, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 157). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 866), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2017-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-17 12:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-03 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-02-03 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 23) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-01-31 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, Kong, Say, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto. |
2017-01-30 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 01-31-17 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB636 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
HB904 (Carry Over) 2017-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 2:16PM in conference room 224.
HB904 (Carry Over) 2017-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 2:16PM in conference room 224.