HI HB898 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 210, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1312).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 210, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1312).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Abolishes the Board of Health. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Board Of Health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Senate | Act 210, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1312). |
2019-07-09 | House | Act 210, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1312). |
2019-05-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 882). |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-30 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 879). |
2019-04-26 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-09-19. |
2019-04-24 | House | The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; S. Chang, Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, B. Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 719). |
2019-04-09 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-05 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 679) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) L. Thielen). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-05-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1772) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 9:05AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 234). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1067), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 660), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-14 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura. |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 02-14-19 9:31AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |