HI HB891 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB891
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a state income tax credit for certain expenses incurred by pre-kindergarten through grade twelve teachers, instructors, school librarians, counselors, principals, registrars, or aides in a school. (HB891 HD1)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) DeCoite voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2). |
2019-02-06 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 65) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-01-31 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2019-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Thursday, 01-31-19 2:15PM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB891 (Carry Over) 2019-02-06 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) DeCoite voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).