HI HB890 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB890
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Transportation to conduct a study that reevaluates the costs and feasibility of constructing a zipper lane along the H-1 freeway in the westbound direction for use during the afternoon hours.
Title
Relating To The Pm Zipper Lane.
Sponsors
Rep. Val Okimoto [R] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] | Rep. Lauren Matsumoto [R] |
Rep. Bob McDermott [R] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Dale Kobayashi [D] | Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] |
Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-12-20 11:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB890 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=890&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB890_.HTM |