HI HB889 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB889
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-17 10:05AM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-17 10:05AM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the cap on the pesticide use revolving fund. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Pesticides.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] |
Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-17 10:05AM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 10:05AM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-24-17 10:05AM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-21-17 10:05AM in conference room 224. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; K. Kahele, Riviere Co-Chairs. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Creagan, DeCoite Co-Chairs; LoPresti, McKelvey, Thielen. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 545). |
2017-04-07 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 502) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) English). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-17. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1327) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Taniguchi. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Reported from AEN/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1024) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Espero, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Taniguchi. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, K. Rhoads. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-17 1:55PM in conference room 414. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to AEN/HRE, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 154). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 934), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Gates, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Tupola. |
2017-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-01-17 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Onishi voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro excused (2). |
2017-02-15 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 336) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-08 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-08-17 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB889 (Carry Over) 2017-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-17 10:05AM in conference room 224.