HI HB878 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Hawaii nonprofit corporations act to permit member actions by ballot and electronic voting, use of electronic notice, and conduct of meeting by teleconference. (HB878 HD1)
Title
Nonprofit Corporations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to CPN. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 186). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 815) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Keith-Agaran, Ito, Luke, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 7 Excused: Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey, Morita. | |
2011-02-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-01-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 176), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2011-02-02 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Yamane, Brower, Cabanilla, Ito, Keith-Agaran, Luke, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Morita, Ching. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-02-11 2:05PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |