HI HB876 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB876

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Removes the statutory requirement for representatives of the pineapple and sugar industries and adds the statutory requirement for representatives of the coffee and diversified agriculture industries on the Advisory Committee on Pesticides.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Advisory Committee On Pesticides.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-10 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-17HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1).
2021-02-17HouseReported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 285), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2021-02-10HouseThe committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Matayoshi, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tokioka; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-02-05HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-10-21 10:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-01-29HouseReferred to AGR, CPC, referral sheet 2
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-25HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1030 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB876 (Carry Over) 2021-02-17 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback