HI HB873 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB873
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LHE with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LHE with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the John A. Burns School of Medicine at the University of Hawaii to study the impact and feasibility of creating a teaching hospital on West Hawaii. (HB873 HD1)
Title
Relating To Teaching Hospitals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LHE with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2). |
2019-02-07 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 153) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LHE. |
2019-02-05 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 02-05-19 9:45AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to HLT, LHE, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB873 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LHE with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
SB1409 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HRE/CPH, WAM.
SB1409 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HRE/CPH, WAM.