HI HB872 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB872
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - The committee(s) on AGR/EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - The committee(s) on AGR/EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use of glyphosate herbicides on or within 100 feet of a school during normal hours.
Title
Relating To Environmental Protection.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Gene Ward [R] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on AGR/EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR/EEP on Wednesday, 02-06-19 9:45AM in House conference room 312. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to AGR/EEP, LHE/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB872 (Carry Over) 2019-02-06 - The committee(s) on AGR/EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=872&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB872_.HTM |