HI HB871 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates the sum of $43,000,000, or so much thereof as may be necessary for fiscal year 20122013, out of the Hospital Sustainability Program Special Fund with such moneys to be used consistent with the Hospital Sustainability Program Special Fund, including the reimbursement of moneys advanced in fiscal year 2012-2013 from the health care payments program (HMS 401).
Title
Emergency appropriation; Department of Human Services ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4). |
2013-02-12 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 314), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-05 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Belatti, Jordan, Morikawa, Woodson, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla. |
2013-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 02-05-13 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-01-25 | House | Received from Governor re: emergency appropriation (Gov. Msg. No. 214). |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1102 (Same As)
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=871&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB871_.htm |