HI HB871 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Updates the Uniform Interstate Family Support Act to reflect requirements of the Hague Convention of the International Recovery of Child Support and Other Forms of Family Maintenance. Provides procedures for registration, recognition, enforcement, and modifications of support orders from countries that are parties to the convention. Effective July 1, 2020. (HB871 HD1)
Title
Uniform Interstate Family Support Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-17-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Hashem excused (2). | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Reported from HUS/INT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 219) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2011-02-10 | (H) The committees on INT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Awana, Hashem, Brower, Choy, Evans, Tokioka, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marumoto; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Nishimoto. | |
2011-02-10 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Jordan, Hanohano, Yamane, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, C. Lee, Morikawa, Wooley. | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS/INT on Thursday, 02-10-11 10:30AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Referred to HUS/INT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Pending introduction. |