HI HB870 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB870
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Souki excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Souki excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that a co-mortgagor assisting a qualified resident in securing a mortgage to purchase a dwelling unit from the Hawaii housing finance and development corporation may be a family member, which also includes extended or hanai family members. Requires a qualified resident who is assisted by a co-mortgager to have an income of at least fifty per cent of the amount required to qualify for a loan to purchase the dwelling unit. (HB870 HD1)
Title
Relating To Mortgages.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Brower [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Souki excused (3). |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 463) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-08 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Kong, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, Lowen, Say, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Wednesday, 02-08-17 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB870 (Carry Over) 2017-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Souki excused (3).
SB584 (Same As) 2017-07-12 - Act 166, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1280).
SB584 (Same As) 2017-07-12 - Act 166, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1280).