HI HB859 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB859
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Higher Education & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Higher Education & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the position of the chief data officer within the office of enterprise technology services to assist the chief information officer in the oversight and management of the State's data portal and computer and data systems. Requires each executive department agency to make appropriate and existing electronic data sets available to the public. Appropriates funds for the establishment of a chief data officer position.
Title
Relating To Government Data Modernization.
Sponsors
Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] | Rep. Ernesto Ganaden [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] |
Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Adrian Tam [D] | Rep. Patrick Branco [D] | Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to HET, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB803 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB859 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to HET, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
HB859 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to HET, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Chief Data Officer
Government Data
Office of Enterprise Technology Services
Open Data Portal
Chief Data Officer
Government Data
Office of Enterprise Technology Services
Open Data Portal
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=859&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB859_.HTM |