HI HB857 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB857
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits operating a motor scooter within the pedestrian mall that abuts the grounds of the State Capitol and Iolani Palace. Appropriates funds to develop the pedestrian mall. Directs DAGS, DOT, DLNR to develop a long-term development plan for the pedestrian mall. Appropriates funds for the expansion and development of a paved walkway and a bike lane. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Traffic.
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] |
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from TRS/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1435) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, English. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 2:25PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to TRS/GVO, JDC/WAM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 418). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1178) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-27 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, McKelvey, Say, Yamane. |
2019-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-27-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-26 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-27-19. |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-26-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Mizuno, Nakamura, Ward excused (5). |
2019-02-13 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 370) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-02-08 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Matayoshi, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-08-19 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2019-01-31 | House | Re-referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 9 |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to TRN/LMG, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB857 (Carry Over) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Bicycle Use
Iolani Palace
Motor Scooter Use
Prohibition
State Capitol
Statewide Traffic Code
Bicycle Use
Iolani Palace
Motor Scooter Use
Prohibition
State Capitol
Statewide Traffic Code