HI HB849 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Act 091, 07/05/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1192).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Act 091, 07/05/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1192).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reinstates the authority of the University of Hawaii System to maintain a separate accounting and financial management system that is compatible with the State of Hawaii accounting and financial system. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The University Of Hawaii Accounting And Financial Management System.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | Act 091, 07/05/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1192). |
2017-07-07 | House | Act 091, on 07/05/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1192). |
2017-04-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2017-04-25 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McKelvey, Oshiro excused (3). |
2017-04-25 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 621). |
2017-04-24 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-13-17. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Kahele Chair; Taniguchi Co-Chair; Dela Cruz, Kidani. |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 616) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1533) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Inouye, Taniguchi, Wakai. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-17 1:40PM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1007) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kidani, Espero, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-17 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 46). |
2017-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 761), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Choy. |
2017-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-22-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-02-13 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 248) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-07 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Creagan, Har, Ing, Ohno, Onishi, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-07-17 2:01PM in House conference room 309. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB144 (Same As) 2017-01-20 - Referred to HRE/GVO, WAM.