HI HB849 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Recodifies Hawaii's emergency management statutes by updating the statutes, clarifying the relationship between the state and county emergency management agencies, and delineating the emergency management functions and powers of the Governor and mayors. Effective July 1, 2050. (HB849 HD1)
Title
Department of Defense; Emergency Management
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-26-13 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-19 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-26-13 2:00PM. |
2013-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-19-13 3:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-14 | House | Re-referred to PBS/VMI, JUD, referral sheet 24 |
2013-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Har, McDermott excused (3). |
2013-02-08 | House | Reported from PBS/VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 247) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-02-07 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Brower, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tsuji, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola. |
2013-02-07 | House | The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ing, Hashem, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamane, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS/VMI on Thursday, 02-07-13 11:15AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to PBS/VMI, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1080 (Same As) 2013-01-24 - Referred to PSM/HTH/JDL, WAM/CPN.