HI HB846 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits owner-builder exemption to residential and farm structures. Specifies owner-builder responsibilities for compliance with construction and labor laws. Amends penalties for noncompliance. Clarifies contractor disclosure requirements to owner-builders. Effective July 1, 2013. (HB846 HD2)
Title
Owner-Builder Exemption; Responsibilities of and Protections for Owner-Builders; Fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to CPN, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 289). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Fale, Hanohano, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 849) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-27 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Cabanilla, Cachola, Ito, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Evans, Har, C. Lee. |
2013-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-27-13 3:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-02-25 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-27-13. |
2013-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-25-13 2:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from WAL/AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 516) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2013-02-13 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Brower, Ohno, Tokioka, Tsuji, Cheape, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Choy, Takayama. |
2013-02-13 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Hanohano, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Coffman, Cullen, Kawakami, C. Lee. |
2013-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/AGR on Wednesday, 02-13-13 8:15AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to WAL/AGR, CPC, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1077 (Same As)