HI HB845 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 209, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1311).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires all new employees within 20 days of being hired to be provided a general orientation on their benefits and rights by the employee's respective jurisdiction. (HB845 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Employee Training.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateAct 209, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1311).
2019-07-09HouseAct 209, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1311).
2019-05-01HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 178).
2019-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 178) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-25SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Moriwaki, S. Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-04-25HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Nishimoto, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, Quinlan.
2019-04-24HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 10:00AM in conference room 423.
2019-04-23HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-19 10:00AM in conference room 423.
2019-04-22HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-19 4:30PM in conference room 423.
2019-04-22HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 948).
2019-04-22SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Moriwaki Co-Chair; S. Chang, Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Nakashima, Quinlan, Matsumoto.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 790) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1921) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele.
2019-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-01-19 10:45AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-19 10:15AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-21SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-21SenateReported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1347) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, S. Chang, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Fevella.
2019-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-19 2:45PM in conference room 224.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to LCA, WAM.
2019-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 228).
2019-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 990), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-22HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Todd, McDermott.
2019-02-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 685) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-12HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-12-19 9:20AM in House conference room 309.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB792 (Same As) 2019-03-20 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback