HI HB844 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB844
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Office of Youth Services to coordinate a two-year Safe Places for Youth Pilot Program in partnership with private organizations to coordinate a network that youth can access for safety and where youth can obtain advice, guidance, programs, and services. Establishes a Safe Places for Youth Pilot Program Coordinator position. Requires a report to the Legislature. Appropriates funds. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Youth.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385). |
2018-03-14 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-01-17 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 1). |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-01-17 | House | Re-referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-17 9:05AM in conference room 229. |
2017-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-17 9:05AM in conference room 229. |
2017-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 9:05AM in conference room 229. |
2017-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-25-17 9:05AM in conference room 229. |
2017-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-24-17 11:05AM in conference room 229. |
2017-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-21-17 9:15AM in conference room 229. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Shimabukuro, S. Chang Co-Chairs. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Morikawa, Gates Co-Chairs; Todd, Ward. |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 612) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1555) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-17 1:35PM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1084) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Wakai. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 03-22-17 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-17 2:50PM in conference room 016. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 149). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Tupola voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 955), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Lowen, Tupola. |
2017-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-01-17 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2017-02-09 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 109) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-03 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Todd, Kobayashi, Oshiro, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Har. |
2017-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Friday, 02-03-17 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB844 (Carry Over) 2017-04-27 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-17 9:05AM in conference room 229.