HI HB843 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB843

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the sunset date to claim the motion picture, digital media, and film production tax credit to December 31, 2035.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Film Tax Credit Extension.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-01-29HouseReferred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 2
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-25HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB843 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 2

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback