HI HB842 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a Hawaii State Planning Act Review Commission to review and make recommendations to the Legislature to update the Hawaii State Planning Act. Removes reference to achieving the viability of Hawaii's sugar and pineapple industries from the Hawaii State Planning Act's agricultural objectives. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Hawaii State Planning Act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Cullen Co-Chairs; Ward.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 788) in amended form (SD 2).
2019-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2002) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2019-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-20SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-20SenateReported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1261) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Inouye, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-03-07SenateThe committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-19 2:45PM in conference room 414.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to EET, WAM.
2019-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 80).
2019-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Say voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 908), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-21HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
2019-02-16HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 631) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-13HouseThe committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Cullen, Nakashima, Morikawa; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Ward.
2019-02-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LMG on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:00PM in House conference room 312.
2019-02-01HouseRe-referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 11
2019-01-28HouseReferred to LMG/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-22HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback